Case Information: 10-CO-1156 | |||
Short Caption: | BRAD K. EDMONDS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-25650-07 | Filed Date: | 09/10/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/10/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/30/2010 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Brad K. Edmonds | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/10/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/23/2010 | ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. (b). (BY: ETW) | |||
09/23/2010 | TMC - OTSC - ROTSC | |||
10/06/2010 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's). | |||
11/08/2010 | ORDERED that the appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED as having been UNTIMELY FILED W/O PREJUDICE to appellant's filing a motion for extensino of time to file the notice of appeal in Superior Court... SEE HARDCOPY (OBNBST) (kt) | |||
11/08/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
11/30/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |