judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID BLOCK: DAVID BLOCK v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0283)
Case Number:S-07-0283Case Docketed On:12/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID BLOCK: DAVID BLOCK v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID BLOCK: DAVID BLOCK, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid BlockJames R. Salisbury
Sean Charles Chambers
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 34
Citation:202 P.3d 1064

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/07/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/12/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Substitution of CounselRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
01/18/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellantFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appeal from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
02/26/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/17/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/21/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/07/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/17/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/13/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Application for award of attorneys' fees and costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/31/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/31/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/3/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal