Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | | 07-11511 |
05/25/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: June 14, 2006 and June 15, 2006. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | | 07-11561 |
05/31/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 01/05/06, 02/28/06, 03/03/06, 03/21/06, 04/06/06, 04/27/06, 05/04/06, 06/08/06, 06/14/06, 08/03/06, 08/17/06, 08/31/06, 02/22/07, 03/01/07, 04/19/07, and 05/01/07. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt, Peggy Isom, JoAnn Orduna, Carlaya Lewis, Renee Silvaggio, Sharon Howard, and Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: 05/25/07. | | 07-11955 |
06/06/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 03/21/06, 04/06/06, 04/27/06, 8/3/06, 8/17/06, 8/31/06, 2/22/07. Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis and Rachelle Hamilton. | | 07-12379 |
06/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-13146 |
06/20/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 1/5/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | | 07-13475 |
06/22/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court reporter Sharon Howard shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcript. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | | 07-13720 |
07/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-14744 |
07/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court Reporters Peggy Isom, JoAnn Orduna and Renee Silvaggio shall submit the requested transcripts within 10 days of the date of this order. Fn1[Court Reporter Howard was granted an extension to file requested transcripts. Transcripts due on July 12, 2007.] Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the last transcript requested within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | | 07-15546 |
07/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-15832 |
07/25/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 05/04/06. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. | | 07-16333 |
07/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Transcripts due: 30 days. | | 07-16376 |
07/30/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | | 07-16743 |
08/06/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | | 07-17267 |
08/31/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. Letter dated August 28, 2007 w/attached copy of letter addressed to Nancy Lemcke, Office of the Public Defender. (FILED PER ORDER 06/19/08). | | 07-19348 |
02/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Fast Track Statement due: 15 days or show cause. Counsel cautioned. | | 08-04505 |
03/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Fast Track Statement. | | 08-05788 |
03/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Orduna: Transcripts due 10 days. Appellant: 20 days from filing of transcripts to file the fast track statement and appendix. | | 08-06363 |
04/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transcripts and Briefing. Court Reporter Orduna: 10 days to file requested transcripts or show cause. Appellant: 40 days to file fast track statement. | | 08-08468 |
05/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-12586 |
06/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions and Granting Motion for an Extension of Time. Conditional Sanction of $250.00 due from court reporter JoAnn Orduna 15 days or transcripts or motion due 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. The clerk shall file the proper person documents submitted on August 20, 2007, August 31, 2007, and February 20, 2008. This court will take no action on the proper person documents. | | 08-15788 |
06/19/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter w/attached courtesy copy of letter addressed to Casey Landis, Office of the Public Defender and letter addressed to Chief Judge. | | 07-18356 |
06/19/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter dated August 28, 2007 w/attached copy of letter addressed to Nancy Lemcke, Office of the Public Defender. | | 07-19348 |
06/19/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter dated February 12, 2008 w/attached copy of letter addressed to Nancy Lemcke, Office of the Public Defender. | | 08-04063 |
07/09/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/3/06, 6/8/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | | 08-17515 |
07/09/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. JoAnn Orduna stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/3/06, 6/8/06. | | 08-17516 |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-18698 |
07/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues within Pages Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. | | 08-19366 |
07/28/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File 38-Page Opening Brief. | | 08-19367 |
07/30/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. to Court that Opening Brief Contains Issues Currently Before this Court and on Calendar for Oral Argument. | | 08-19666 |
07/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions and Orderering Full Briefing. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on July 28, 2008. | | 08-19940 |
07/31/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 08-19370 |
07/31/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | | 08-19371 |
09/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-22747 |
10/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 3, 2008. | | 08-25823 |
11/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-28501 |
11/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: December 4, 2008. | | 08-29176 |
11/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 08-30037 |
05/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | | 09-11950 |
05/14/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
08/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | | 09-18890 |
08/28/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 09-19254 |
08/28/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
09/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2009. | | 09-19254 |