Case Information: 49527 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: ESTATE OF RIDDLE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P12682 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/25/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/25/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. and Request for Stay. | 07-11632 | |
05/25/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-11634 | |
05/25/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days | 07-11653 | |
06/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Branton & Sullivan--check no. 1190. | ||
06/04/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or A Writ of Prohibition, and Request for Stay. | 07-12147 | |
06/28/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Due: 30 days. Fn1 [Because petitioner has not filed a proper motion for a stay in this court, as required we need not consider petitioner's request.] | 07-14121 | |
07/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Co-Administrator Debra Ilunga's Emergency Motion for Enlargement of Time. | 07-16762 | |
08/01/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. (Real Party in Interest Croysdill) | 07-16932 | |
08/13/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Ms. Illunga: Answer due August 29, 2007. | 07-17734 | |
08/16/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request for Leave to File Reply. | 07-18137 | |
08/31/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Debra Ilunga's Answer | 07-19327 | |
09/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Leave to file a Reply. Petitioner's reply due: 30 days. | 07-21212 | |
10/29/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply to Answer of Lawrence Croysdill. | 07-23642 | |
01/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We therefore deny the petition." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-00448 | |
02/05/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-01935 | |
02/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |