judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DERMODY VS. JONES

Case Information: 49518
Short Caption:DERMODY VS. JONESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV20555Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/24/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
05/24/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Cal J. Potter, III, Esq., Chtd.--check no. 23366.
05/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11537
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. 07-12340
06/20/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13441
06/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-13505
07/02/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-14442
07/02/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-14444
07/16/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-15393
10/25/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-23538
10/25/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 07-23539
11/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). 07-24115
11/05/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.