Case Information: 49511 | |||
Short Caption: | HILL (EDDIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C200748 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-11516 | |
06/12/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Reciept for documents daed 05/24/07, addressed to Eddie Hill returned. No forwarding address. | ||
07/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-14925 | |
07/12/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and appendix due: 20 days. | 07-15171 | |
07/16/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 06/08/06 and 05/01/07. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: 07/05/07. | 07-15400 | |
07/30/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16737 | |
07/30/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-16742 | |
07/30/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-16744 | |
08/07/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17348 | |
10/22/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Schorn shall filed the transcript of 5/1/07 within 10 days of this order. | 07-23249 | |
10/31/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/1/07. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 07-23897 | |
01/04/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-00335 | |
01/29/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-01263 | |
01/29/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/01/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 30, 2008. | 08-01263 |