judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

C. GIBSON DUNN, M.D., V. VICKY L. WILEY

Case Information: 96-CV-1624
Short Caption:C. GIBSON DUNN, M.D., V. VICKY L. WILEYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 96-CV-1622 Consolidated: 96-CV-1623 , 96-CV-1624
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA193-96Filed Date:10/21/1996

Opening Event Date:10/21/1996Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/1997

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeC. Gibson Dunn N
Susan T. Preston NN
Appellant-Cross-AppelleePsychiatric Institutes of America Inc.N
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeLeesburg Institute Inc.N
Carol A. Petren NN
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeApogee of Tennessee Inc.N
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeMetropolitan Psychiatric GroupN
Susan T. Preston NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantVicky L. Wiley N
Kenneth D. Pack NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/21/1996NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/28/1996APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT
10/28/1996$50.00 DOCKETING FEE
10/28/1996DESIGNATION OF RECORD
11/29/1996APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to court's order of 11/8/96. (signed & filed by: Julia A. Dahlberg)
01/29/1997ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 96-CV-1622, 96-CV-1623, and 96-CV-1624 for all purposes. FO that these appeals are hereby stayed pending resolution of the lead cases, Eric T., et al. v. National Enterprise Medical Inc., et al., no. 95-CV-118. FO that all parties shall notify this court within 15 days from the date of this order if there are any other cross-appeals filed from civil actions CA193-96. If a party determines that a cross-appeal in CA193-96 has not been docketed by this court, that party shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, transmit a copy of a stamped notice of appeal to this court for processing. (FARDGA)
01/29/1997CASE STAYED
10/16/1997ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. appellant_ shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, show cause why the stay should not be lifted and appeals. nos. 96-CV-1622, 96-CV-1623 and 96-CV-1624 remanded to the trial court for further proceedings pursuant to ERic T. et al., v. National Medical Enterprises, In c., et al.(By: AMW)sw
10/28/1997RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
10/30/1997APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE -to order to show cause filed by: NME
11/20/1997JUDGMENT: The stay in this case is hereby vacated. F/O that the conditional dismissals entered as to the cross-appellants are hereby vacated, and their cases remanded to the trial court for further proceedings consistent with Eric T., et al. v. National Medical Enterprises, Inc., no. 95-CV-1118 (D.C. August 21, 1997). On remand, the trial court shall determine whether it has personal jurisdiction over these defendants. In the event that the court lacks personal jurisdiction over any of these defendants, the complaint against that defendant shall be unconditionally dismissed on jurisdictional grounds. If the court determines that it has personal jurisdiction over one or more of these defendants, then the previously entered order dismissing the complaint on the grounds of forum non conveniens shall be reinstated as to those defendants. F/O that as to all other parties, the orders on appeal are hereby affirmed. (FA, RD, GA) (By: GP)
11/20/1997PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
11/20/1997REMANDED
11/24/1997RECEIVED - RECORD
12/12/1997MANDATE ISSUED