Case Information: 49510 | |||
Short Caption: | MOAYEDI (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C229303 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-11504 | |
05/24/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/5/07 and 4/23/07. Court Reporters: Angela Lee and Blanca Cano. Filed in district court on: May 21, 2007. | 07-11505 | |
06/19/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/23/07. Court Reporter: Blanca I. Cano. | 07-13353 | |
07/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-14735 | |
07/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have 25 days from the date of this order in which to file the fast track statement and appendix. | 07-15062 | |
08/08/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-17419 | |
08/08/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-17420 | |
08/21/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-18485 | |
10/03/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-21782 | |
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22200 | |
10/30/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/09/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2007. | 07-22200 |