Case Information: 53381 | |||
Short Caption: | MORAGA VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A572393 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-05931 | |
03/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Proper Person Transcript Request. | 09-07343 | |
04/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Second Request for Enlargement of Time to File Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-08344 | |
04/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. | 09-08778 | |
05/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's motions for extension of time, filed on March 23, 2009, and April 2, 2009, and his motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal without prejudice, filed on April 8, 2009.] | 09-11840 | |
06/09/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13808 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2009. | 09-13808 |