judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

YOUSIF VS. HAMIKA

Case Information: 49530
Short Caption:YOUSIF VS. HAMIKACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A472039Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/24/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
05/25/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kirk T. Kennedy--check no. 4029.
05/25/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11648
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 07-12335
06/08/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12602
06/08/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Serve D/S on Settlement Judge. Due date: 10 days. 07-12603
06/14/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-13023
07/02/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. because both parties had trial scheduled. Set for July 9, 2007. 07-14403
07/13/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-15236
08/29/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-19125
09/12/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20112
10/03/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: February 20, 21, 22, 23, and 26, 2007. To Court Reporter: 8th JDC, Dept. 12. 07-21828
11/02/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Thelma Stapley concerning the delay in filing transcripts. 07-24085
11/21/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Pay Deposit. Appellant: 7 days to pay the deposit for requested transcripts and provide this court with proof of payment. Ms. Stapley: 37 days to file requested transcripts. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order. 07-25398
11/28/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-25649
12/10/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Proof of Compliance with Order. 07-26789
12/24/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcript. 07-27847
01/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due 40 days. Ms. Stapley: 10 days to file transcripts. 08-00399
01/18/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Letter from Court Reporter Thelma Stapley. 08-01486
02/04/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. Appellant's counsel is once again admonished for his failure to timely remit payment for the requested transcripts. We direct counsel to pay the balance due and provide this court with proof of payment, within 7 days of the date of this order, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. Ms. Stapley: 7 days to deliver the requested transcripts to counsel for appellant and file copies in this court as well as the district court. 08-02731
02/13/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/20/07, 02/21/07, 02/22/07, 02/23/07, and 02/26/07. Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 08-03685
02/14/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Second Motion to Continue Time to File Opening Brief and Response to Order Regarding Transcripts. 08-03751
02/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: March 28, 2008. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 08-04645
03/31/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-07898
03/31/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-07899
04/08/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 30, 2008. 08-08722
06/02/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-13819
06/02/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 08-13821
07/16/2008Case Status Update Briefing Completed. Briefing complete. No Reply Brief filed.
09/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 08-24694
09/24/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-03189
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04633
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2009. 09-04633