Case Information: 49496 | |||
Short Caption: | BLACKWELL VS. RODRIGUEZ | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A534825 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/23/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nora Blackwell--USPS Money Order No. 10623862631. | ||
05/23/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-11359 | |
06/11/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-12747 | |
07/06/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-14754 | |
07/23/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. | 07-16088 | |
08/17/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-16502 | |
08/17/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/24/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 21, 2007. | 07-16502 |