judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICO-ARREOLA (OSCAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49512
Short Caption:RICO-ARREOLA (OSCAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 61859
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C222938Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/05/2009 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/05/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/24/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 07-11506
06/07/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/07/06, 7/17/06 (Schmidt); 1/17/07, 3/13/07, 3/14/07, 3/15/07, 3/16/07; 4/24/07 (D'Amato); 2/20/07, 3/06/07, 3/08/07 (Schorn); 2/23/07 (Vincent). 07-12460
06/07/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12462
06/15/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/23/07. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 07-13173
06/20/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/7/06 and 7/17/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. 07-13474
06/27/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/20/07, 3/06/07 and 3/08/07. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 07-14064
08/10/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Joseph D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-17687
09/24/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 22, 2007. 07-21025
10/24/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-23450
11/14/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. Appellant has filed a motion requesting a second extension of time to file the opening brief. We grant the motion. Appellant: 45 days to file the opening brief and appendix. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the March 13-16, 2007, transcripts. We note that Mr. D'Amato's notice does not certify that copies of the January 17, 2007, or April 24, 2007, transcripts have been provided to appellant's counsel. However, in the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to these transcripts as well. Within 20 days of the date of this notice, Mr. D'Amato shall prepare and deliver copies of the January 17, 2007, and April 24, 2007, transcripts to counsel for appellant. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attahced to this order.] 07-24818
01/07/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-00400
01/09/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Joseph A. D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/17/07, 3/13-16, 2007 and 4/24/07. 08-00594
02/13/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-03616
02/27/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the oepning brief and appendix received on 2/13/08. Answering brief due: 30 days. 08-04773
02/27/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-03617
02/27/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-03619
03/27/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-07661
05/05/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 28, 2008. 08-11101
06/09/2008Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
06/13/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-15125
06/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: June 27, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15695
07/03/2008BriefReceived Reply Brief. 08-17028
07/09/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-17458
07/11/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on July 3, 2008. 08-17687
07/11/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 7/11/08. 08-17028
09/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to File Supplemental Appendix. Appellant: 5 days to file a supplemental appendix containing the March 13, 2007, voir dire proceedings in their entirety. 08-24497
09/26/2008AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 08-24967
11/24/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on January 7, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc) 08-29931
12/23/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 08-32552
01/07/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/09/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation Requesting an Order of Limited Remand. 09-06012
03/12/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand. Status report due: 45 days. 09-06280
04/29/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. (In response to order filed 3/12/09). 09-10675
05/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties shall have 45 days to file a supplemental written status report. 09-10857
06/15/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Second Status Report Regarding Order of Limited Remand to Correct Record. 09-14865
06/15/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File A Supplemental Answering Brief. 09-14869
06/15/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File A Joint Supplemental Appendix 09-14870
06/17/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the joint supplemental appendix submitted via E-Flex. Supplemental Opening Brief due: 21 days. Supplemental Answering Brief due: 21 days from service of supplemental opening brief. Optional Supplemental Reply Brief due: 7 days from service of supplemental answering brief. 09-15075
06/17/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Supplemental Appendix 09-15078
07/09/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Opening Brief. 09-16850
07/29/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief 09-18540
08/03/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Appendix. 09-18905
08/05/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Supplemental Reply Brief 09-19090
09/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. before the en banc court on 10/5/09, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes. 09-22416
09/21/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-22819
10/05/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 11-11670
05/16/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-14398
05/16/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
06/06/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 20, 2011. 11-14398