judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS VS. CITY OF SPARKS C/W 49682/50251

Case Information: 49504
Short Caption:ADAMS VS. CITY OF SPARKS C/W 49682/50251Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:49504*, 49682 , 50251 Related Case(s): 49682 , 50251
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602410Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/05/2007 / Rose, Senior Justice RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/07/2009 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/07/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/24/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison & Howard--check no. 078499.
05/24/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11486
06/04/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/02/07 and 04/13/07. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. 07-12168
06/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Transcripts. 07-12169
06/05/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Senior Justice Robert Rose 07-12238
06/06/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Request for Transcripts. 07-12405
06/08/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12590
06/25/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/2/07 and 4/13/07. Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. 07-13775
07/02/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-14371
08/13/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 49504/49682-cases are not consolidated. 07-17829
08/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. and Reninstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement in these matters. If additional transcripts are necessary, appellants may file a supplemental transcript request form. Opening Brief due: 45 days. Nos. 49504/49682. 07-19101
09/14/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address (Lewis & Roca). Nos. 49504/49682 07-20310
10/10/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. to Consolidate Appeals and Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule; Request for Waiver of Page Limit. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. (Nos. 49504/49682 not consolidated w/50251.) 07-22352
10/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. in docket no. 49682. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days to show cause why the appeal in case no. 49682 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 5 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Nos. 49504/49682. 07-22934
10/25/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 49504/49682. 07-23605
10/30/2007MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. (City of Sparks) Nos. 49504/49682. 07-23812
10/31/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. in Docket No. 49682. Nos. 49504/49682. 07-23854
11/21/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We approve the stipulation filed on October 10, 2007. The appeal in Docket No. 50251 shall be consolidated for appellate purposes with the appeals consolidated in Docket Nos. 49504 an d49682. Opening Brief and appendix due: November 30, 2007; Answering Brief due: January 30, 2008; and Reply Brief due: February 29, 2008 (if deemed necessary). The parties are permitted to file briefs not to exceed 50 pages in length. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 07-25373
12/03/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 07-25988
12/03/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 15. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 07-25990
12/21/2007MotionFiled Motion. Respondent Red Hawk Land Company's Motion: (1) to Strike Issues not Properly before the Court on Appeal, (2) to Strike Facts not Supported by the Record, and (3) to Extend Time. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 07-27736
12/24/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Notice of Joinder in "Respondent Red Hawk Land Company's Motion: (1) to Strike Issues Not Properly Before the Court on Appeal, (2) To Strike Facts Not Supported by the Record; and (3) to Extend Time. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 07-27908
12/28/2007MotionFiled Stipulation. for extention of time for appellants to respond to Red Hawk Land Company's Motion (1) to strike Issues not properly before the court on appeal; (2) to strike facts not supported by the record, and (3) to extend time. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 (07-28154). 07-28154
01/25/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-02043
01/29/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The stipulation is approved. The clerk shall file the response to Red Hawk's motion received on January 3, 2008. Red Hawk's motion to strike is denied. Red Hawk's motion for an extension of time to file its answering brief is granted. Red Hawk and the City of Sparks: 14 days to file and serve their answering briefs. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 (08-02222). 08-02222
01/29/2008MotionFiled Motion. Appellants' Response to Respondent Red Hawk Land Company's Motion: (1) to Strike Issues not Properly Before the Court on Appeal, (2) to Strike Facts not Supported by the Record, and (3) to Extend Time. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 (08-00259). 08-00259
02/11/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents City of Sparks and Sparks City Council. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-03393
02/12/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Red Hawk Land Company, LLC's Answering Brief. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-03494
03/14/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. (08-06481) 08-06481
03/27/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent City of Sparks: Daniel T. Hayward and the law firm of Laxalt & Nomura, Ltd. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-07670
05/23/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Parraguirre (voluntary recusal). 08-13045
11/24/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on January 7, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-29928
12/23/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 08-32548
12/31/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Justice-elect Pickering has determined that Red Hawk Resorts' donation does not raise any issue of actual or implied bias. Accordingly, Justice-elect Pickering will not recuse herself from consideration of this appeal. Nos. 49504/49682/50251 08-33117
01/07/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Nos. 49504/49682/50251.
03/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having reviewed appellants' response and respondents' replies, it appears that this court does, in fact, lack jurisdiction to review the order appealed in Docket No. 49682. However, we decline to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 49682. Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 09-05439
07/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-JH/MD/MC/NS/MG/KP fn1[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Nos. 49504/49682/50251. 09-17864
07/27/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 7/21/09 addressed to Judge Jerome Polaha at PO Box 30083. Per USPS, "return to sender, not deliverable as addressed unable to forward". Address updated per Second Judicial website. Order remailed to Judge Polaha. 09-18345
08/18/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-18467
08/18/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 21, 2009. 09-18467