Case Information: 49506 | |||
Short Caption: | MGM SALES, INC. VS. VANDICO ENTERPRISES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49849 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0601750 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/04/2007 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11500 | |
05/24/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-11503 | |
06/04/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 07-12136 | |
06/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Charles B. Woodman - check no. 2224. | ||
06/12/2007 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten, proof of service incomplete. | 07-12810 | |
06/20/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13487 | |
07/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15684 | |
07/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. | 07-15688 | |
12/14/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 07-27152 | |
12/24/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge requests that these cases remain in settlement until February 29, 2008. Nos. 49506/49849-cases are not consolidated. | 07-27844 | |
02/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge shall file the final settlement conference status report by February 29, 2008. | 08-03069 | |
03/05/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. Second Notice. | 08-05502 | |
03/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge requests 90-day extension for counsel to complete negotiations. | 08-05873 | |
05/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Settlement Judge's time for filing the Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to June 16, 2008. | 08-12329 | |
06/30/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. 49506 and 49849. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The stipulation to dismiss these appeals will be filed after the terms of the settlement agreement have been fulfilled. | 08-16632 | |
09/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-24501 | |
10/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-25671 | |
10/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 08-26074 | |
10/09/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |