Case Information: 49505 | |||
Short Caption: | LEWIS VS. CABRERA-LAZO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45961 , 51372 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0302180 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/19/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-11488 | |
06/18/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-13238 | |
06/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. DV0302180. 30 days. | 07-14019 | |
07/19/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-15797 | |
07/19/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/13/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP-JH/RP/MD. | 07-24649 | |
12/12/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26360 | |
12/12/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/02/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 27, 2007. | 07-26360 |