Case Information: 49497 | |||
Short Caption: | MORA (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53135 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR060897 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/23/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/23/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-11375 | |
06/12/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for documents dated 05/23/07, addressed to Jose Mora returned. No forwarding address. | ||
07/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. | 07-14574 | |
07/23/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast Track Statement due: 10 days. | 07-16112 | |
08/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-17150 | |
08/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and Granting Motion for an Extension of Time. We conclude that Sexton must fulfill the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 07-18496 | |
09/10/2007 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 08/21/07, addressed to Jose Mora re-mailed to corrected address. | ||
09/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-20808 | |
09/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. for filing Fast Track Statement. Due: 20 days. | 07-21327 | |
10/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Fast Track Statement. | 07-23463 | |
10/30/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix submitted provisionally submitted on October 24, 2007. | 07-23762 | |
10/30/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-23465 | |
10/30/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-23466 | |
11/07/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-24296 | |
01/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-00660 | |
02/05/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-02099 | |
02/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/13/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 07, 2008. | 08-02099 |