Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/23/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
05/23/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 07-11382 |
05/23/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/24/00, 3/1/00, 10/3/00, 7/7/04, 4/27/05, 8/1/05 and 8/3/05. Court Reporters: Yvonne Valentin, Kristine Moore and Sonia Riley. Filed in district court on: May 16, 2007. | | 07-11383 |
05/23/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Michael Cherry (parties.) | | 07-11384 |
05/25/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/2/07; 8/1/05/; 8/3/05. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. | | 07-11645 |
06/07/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 07-12436 |
09/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-20676 |
12/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening brief due; 1/15/08. | | 07-27664 |
01/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-01003 |
01/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 14, 2008. | | 08-01540 |
02/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-04023 |
02/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. | | 08-04594 |
03/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Late File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix on March 31, 2008. | | 08-06860 |
03/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix no later than March 31, 2008. | | 08-07393 |
05/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. We impose the following conditional sanction. Ms. Erickson: 15 days to pay $500.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated if Ms. Erickson files and serves the opening brief and appendix or, alternatively, a motion to extend time, within 10 days from the date of this order. | | 08-11302 |
05/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Fourth Request. | | 08-12789 |
05/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the opening brief. Due: June 2, 2008. Erickson cautioned. Fn1 [ . . . The conditional sanction against Erickson therefore has been vacated.] | | 08-13334 |
06/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Fifth Request. | | 08-14116 |
06/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 15, 2008. | | 08-14647 |
07/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Seventh Request. | | 08-19489 |
08/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time, Directing Clerk to File Opening Brief and Appendix, and Directing Counsel to Comply with NRAP 25, 28, and 28A. Despite deficiencies, in the interest of justice after the delay in this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief and appendix received on July 29, 2008. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 25, 28, and 28A by filing signed and dated copies of the final page of the opening brief, the attorney's certificate, and the certificate of service. | | 08-20448 |
08/07/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 08-19491 |
08/07/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1-6. | | 08-19496 |
09/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to this Court's August 7, 2008 Order (containing signed and dated copies of the final page of the opening brief, the attorney's certificate, and the certificate of service). | | 08-22706 |
09/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-23335 |
09/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering brief due 11/7/08. | | 08-24004 |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 58 Page Answering Brief. | | 08-28665 |
11/10/2008 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 11/17/08. | | 08-28666 |
11/10/2008 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Vols. 1 through 11. FILED PER ORDER OF 11/17/08. | | 08-28669 |
11/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 58-page answering brief and the appendix received on 11/10/08. | | 08-29130 |
11/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-28666 |
11/17/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 through 11. | | 08-28669 |
12/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60 days). | | 08-32225 |
12/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until 2/17/09 to file the reply brief. | | 08-32738 |
02/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). | | 09-04439 |
03/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Reply brief due 30 days. | | 09-05219 |
04/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). | | 09-08392 |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Extension of Time. The briefing in this case is deemed completed. | | 09-09211 |
04/13/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | | |
04/09/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Notification letter from Kenneth J. McKenna, Esq. requesting he be notified when a decision is filed. | | 10-09395 |
04/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-RP/JH/MD/NS/MG/KP fn4[The Honorable Michael Cherry, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | | 10-10296 |
05/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 10-12073 |
05/13/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 1 Submitted in Support of Petition for Rehearing. (CD's Exhibit B and Exhibit C) | | 10-12496 |
06/23/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. | | 10-16342 |
07/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time (First Request) | | 10-17630 |
07/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: July 28, 2010. | | 10-18031 |
07/27/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 10-19459 |
10/06/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. We conclude that rehearing is not warranted on this or any other ground McKenna tendered in his rehearing petition. "We therefore deny the petition." Fn3 [The Honorable, Michael Cherry, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participating in the decision in this matter.] | | 10-25889 |
10/06/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Amended Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1 [We issue this amnded decision in place of the Order of Affirmance issued on April 20, 2010.] Fn6 [The Honorable Michael Cherry, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision in this matter.] | | 10-25893 |
11/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-28450 |
11/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 9, 2010. | | 10-28450 |