Case Information: 49492 | |||
Short Caption: | D.R. HORTON, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (DORRELL SQUARE HOMEOWNERS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51262 , 52827 , 55798 , 57887 , 64131 , 64492 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A527688 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/22/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 085519. | ||
05/22/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 07-11273 | |
05/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 1 of 4. | 07-11276 | |
05/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 2 of 4. | 07-11279 | |
05/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 3 of 4. | 07-11280 | |
05/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 4 of 4. | 07-11281 | |
05/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Law Cited in D.R. Horton Inc's Petition | 07-11291 | |
05/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition or Mirror Writ in the First Light Case. | 07-11292 | |
05/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Writ Petition Proceedings. | 07-11294 | |
05/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition or Mirror Writ in the First Light Case. | 07-11339 | |
05/24/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition or Mirror Writ in the First Light Case. | 07-11438 | |
05/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Writ Petition Proceedings. | 07-11938 | |
06/04/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Having considered the motion for stay and opposition thereto, we grant petitioner's motion to the following extent. We temporarily stay the proceedings below pending receipt and consideration of an additional response to the motion for stay. Additional response due from the real party in interest due: 10 days. After the response is filed, this court will determine if a reply is necessary and whether a permanent stay is warranted. We deny the motion to consolidate this proceeding with that in Docket No. 47654. | 07-12139 | |
06/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn4[We vacate our June 4, 2007 order temporarily staying the proceedings below. Real party in interest thus no longer needs to file an additional response to petitioner's stay motion.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-12545 | |
07/05/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-13559 | |
07/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |