judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BACON VS. RIGGS

Case Information: 49493
Short Caption:BACON VS. RIGGSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0601522UClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/22/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Ronald J. Logar--check no. 10459.
05/22/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 07-11304
06/07/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12457
06/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 07-13375
06/22/2007Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 07-13756
09/20/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion and Stipulation Requesting Remand to District Court Pursuant to the Huneycutt Procedure. 07-20800
10/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Added Carson City District Attorney as a respondent.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. 07-21877
10/12/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We defer ruling on the stipulation filed September 20, 2007. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file in this court a file-stamped copy of an order of the district court certifying that upon remand, it is inclined to grant the parties' requested relief. 07-22685
10/31/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Notice of Filing Pursuant to the October 12, 2007 Order. 07-23928
12/18/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand. 07-27435
01/04/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Attorney Richard Staub substituted in place and stead of Attorney Eric Pulver. 08-00329
01/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt Certification. We grant the parties' previously-filed motion. This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct proceedings and enter an order pursuant to its certification. Appellant shall file a report with this court regarding the status of the district court proceedings within 30 days from the date of this order. If the decision of the district court renders this appeal moot, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal within the same time period. Briefing in this matter is stayed pending further order of this court. Fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's 'Motion for Remand' filed on December 13, 2007.] 08-00386
02/25/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Appellant's status report or stipulation to dismiss due 10 days. 08-04506
02/28/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Status Report. 08-04961
04/30/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Appellant's Status Report or Stipulation to Dismiss due: 10 days. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. 08-10728
05/06/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant Bacon. 08-11248
05/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a report with this court regarding the status of the district court proceedings. If the decision of the district court renders this appeal moot, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal within the same time period. 08-12110
07/08/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant Bacon. 08-17369
07/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have until August 11, 2008, to file a report with this court regarding the status of the disrict court proceedings. If the decision of the district court renders this appeal moot, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal within the same time period. 08-18615
08/11/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant Bacon. 08-20756
10/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant: 15 days to file status report. If the decision of the district court renders this appeal moot, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal within the same time period. 08-27246
10/28/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 08-27671
12/19/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a report with this court regarding the status of the district court proceedings. If a decision of the district court renders this appeal moot, the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss this appeal within the same time period. 08-32198
02/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-03215
02/10/2009Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Received Status Report. (submitted by Appellant). (FILED PER ORDER 02/27/09). 09-03617
02/10/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Reconsideration. 09-03618
02/10/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. 09-03620
02/12/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Richard S. Staub, Esq.. Check no. 9098.
02/27/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Having reviewed appellant's petition for rehearing along with his updated status report, we conclude that rehearing is not warranted. Accordingly, we deny appellant's petition for rehearing. fn1[Having considered appellant's status report in resolving appellant's rehearing petition, we direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's February 10, 2009, status report.] 09-05134
02/27/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant's Status Report. 09-03617
03/02/2009MotionFiled Motion. Request for Submission. 09-05268
03/05/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Request for Submission. We deny as moot appellant's request for submission. 09-05583
03/24/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-06324
03/24/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/01/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 25, 2009. 09-06324