Case Information: 53393 | |||
Short Caption: | CRAWLEY (BRYAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54917 , 55045 , 67477 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C233433 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/11/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. CRAWLEY - C233433 for BRYAN CRAWLEY, Defendant | 09-06154 | |
03/10/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction. Due Date: 10 days. | 09-06730 | |
03/24/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). Certified copy of order filed in district court on 3/10/09. | 09-07441 | |
03/26/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/27/09. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. | 09-07626 | |
03/26/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/25/08. To Court Reporter: Cheryl Carpenter. | 09-07627 | |
03/26/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07632 | |
07/15/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant Crawley | 09-17400 | |
07/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-17816 | |
07/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: October 5, 2009. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforseeable circumstances. | 09-17917 | |
10/06/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-24367 | |
10/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension. Opening brief and appendix due 1/4/10. | 09-24758 | |
01/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (90) days. | 10-00436 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 5, 2010. | 10-00692 | |
04/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (21) days. | 10-09153 | |
04/23/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Oening brief and appendix due: April 30, 2010. | 10-10581 | |
04/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Opening Brief. Granted: 46 pages. | 10-10957 | |
04/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-10960 | |
04/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Volumes 1-22. | 10-10961 | |
05/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-13721 | |
05/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: June 25, 2010. | 10-13722 | |
06/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second request. (30) days. | 10-16560 | |
06/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 26, 2010. | 10-16749 | |
07/26/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Appendix | 10-19175 | |
07/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 45 Page Answering Brief. | 10-19332 | |
07/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. 45 pages granted. Answering Brief. | 10-19333 | |
07/26/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-19334 | |
08/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | 10-21777 | |
08/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Time for filing Reply brief extended to November 23, 2010. | 10-21974 | |
11/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to file Reply Brief. (45) days. | 10-30570 | |
11/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion in Part. Reply brief due December 23, 2010. | 10-30822 | |
12/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Enlarge Page Limitation of Reply Brief. | 10-33592 | |
12/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 22 pages granted. | 10-33593 | |
12/23/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-33594 | |
05/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. | 11-14014 | |
05/11/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/29/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-29761 | |
10/24/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-32679 | |
10/24/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 31, 2011. | 11-32679 |