Case Information: 53392 | |||
Short Caption: | DOYLE VS. HARTNELL (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56129 , 65080 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D391016 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/11/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/10/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/10/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-06151 | |
03/10/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-06152 | |
04/01/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Isabel Banks. Check no. 1532. | ||
04/01/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-08205 | |
05/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Amended Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | 09-11444 | |
05/15/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-12157 | |
06/11/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-4. | 09-14624 | |
06/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/12/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-14706 | |
06/23/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 6/11/09 addressed to Shanda M. Hartnell. Per stamp on envelope, "Attempted Not Known". No forwarding address. | 09-15585 | |
07/16/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter from respondent Shanda Hartnell. | 09-17483 | |
10/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We lack jurisdiction to consider this appeal, and we dismiss it." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-25835 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27727 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. | 09-27727 |