Case Information: 49516 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL VS. OLD REPUBLIC TITLE COMPANY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A530918 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/05/2007 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stanley W. Pierce--check no. 37820. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11530 | |
06/05/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 07-12227 | |
06/11/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-12684 | |
06/14/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-13030 | |
07/16/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-15379 | |
07/26/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-16410 | |
08/13/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/23/07. To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | 07-17831 | |
09/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 26, 2007. | 07-20890 | |
09/28/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Transcript dated 4/23/07 served upon opposing counsel. | 07-21489 | |
11/16/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24999 | |
11/16/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 07-25000 | |
12/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 17, 2008. | 07-26405 | |
01/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-01171 | |
01/18/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Transcripts. Ms. Tuchman is no longer obligated to file a copy of the April 23, 2007, transcript. | 08-01425 | |
02/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-02789 | |
03/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's summary judgment order." Sanctions appear warranted. Attorney Pierce shall have fifteen days from this order's date within which to show cause why he should not be personally sanctioned for failing to comply with our appellate procedural rules. Fn1 [We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-05722 | |
03/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Attorney Stanley Pierce. | 08-07005 | |
03/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 08-07161 | |
03/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file an amended verified bill of costs which specifically details the costs incurred in producing copies of briefs or appendices. | 08-07426 | |
04/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Reply to Response to Order Directing Counsel to Show Cause why Sanctions Should not be Imposed. | 08-08271 | |
04/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Amended Verified Bill of Costs. | 08-08299 | |
04/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Approving Amended Bill of Costs. We direct the clerk of this court to issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $88.20 for insertion in the remittitur. | 08-09564 | |
04/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: in the amount of $88.20. | 08-09642 | |
04/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memoradum of Costs and Disbursements in the amount of $88.20. | 08-07637 | |
04/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/28/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 21, 2008. | 08-07637 | |
07/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pierce shall, within 15 days from the date this order is entered, pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. fn1-[We deny respondents' request to award attorney fees and costs as sanctions for the deficient briefs filed by Pierce.] | 08-17523 | |
07/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Receipt of $500.00 sanction paid to the Supreme Court Law Library on July 10, 2008. | 08-19242 |