Case Information: 49515 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON (NATASHA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C208265 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/24/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/24/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-11520 | |
05/24/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/1/05, 8/16/05, 8/18/05, 1/5/06, 4/11/06, 12/5/06, 4/10/07 and 4/17/07. Court Reporters: Janie Olsen, Richard Kangas and Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: May 21, 2007. | 07-11521 | |
05/24/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Michael A. Cherry sat in district court proceedings. | 07-11524 | |
06/01/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 4/10/07 and 4/17/07. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | 07-12084 | |
06/07/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 2/1/05, 8/16/05, 8/18/05, 1/5/06 and 4/11/06 (Olsen); 12/5/06 (Kangas) | 07-12497 | |
07/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-14924 | |
07/12/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and appendix due: 20 days. | 07-15172 | |
08/06/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-17232 | |
08/06/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 5. | 07-17233 | |
08/22/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-18593 | |
11/13/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-24635 | |
12/12/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26361 | |
12/12/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2007. | 07-26361 |