judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORTH (SEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49522
Short Caption:ORTH (SEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55269 , 62423
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062177Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/2008How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/25/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 07-11551
06/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. 07-13503
07/06/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-14727
07/06/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/29/06, 12/01/06, 12/04/06, and 05/04/07. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. 07-14728
07/06/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/07. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 07-14730
07/06/2007MotionFiled Motion. Attorney Michael C. Novi. 07-14732
07/10/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 11/29/06, 12/01/06, 12/04/06-12/06/06, and 05/04/07. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. 07-14978
07/10/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 05/01/07. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 07-14983
07/17/2007Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on July 13, 2007. Michael C. Novi, Esq. be relieved as counsel for appellant. 07-15497
07/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Michael C. Novi filed a motion to withdraw as appellant's counsel. We grant the motion to withdraw. We accept the district court's determination that Mary Lou Wilson shall be appellant's counsel for this appeal. Supplemental Docketing Statement due: 20 days. Transcript Request due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 07-16130
08/06/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Statement Advising that no Supplemental Docketing Statement will be filed. 07-17201
08/06/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 05/01/07. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 07-17202
08/06/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 11/29/06, 12/01/06, 12/04/06-12/06/06, and 05/04/07. To Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. 07-17211
08/06/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Cecilia Vohl stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Nos. 49522/49476. (Cases are not consolidated.) 07-17271
08/07/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Second Amended Request. Transcripts requested: 05/01/07. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 07-17310
08/07/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-17356
09/24/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Transcripts. Appellant shall include copies of the listed transcripts in the appendix to the opening brief, and neither Ms. Vohl nor Ms. Zihn are obligated to file copies of the transcripts in this court. fn1[Copies of the transcript request form are attached to this order. fn2[We remind Ms. Vohl that she must file these transcripts in the district court in order to be in full compliance with NRAP 9(a). 07-20963
10/22/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Leave of Court to file Appellant's Opening Brief Forty Days beyond this Court's Order or December 3, 2007. 07-23279
10/25/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: 12/3/07. 07-23506
11/30/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-25946
11/30/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 07-25947
12/20/2007MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Allow Filing and Review of Issues in Appellant's Proper Person Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 3/20/08. 07-27610
12/20/2007BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. In Proper Person Supplemental Brief. RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER OF 3/20/07. 07-27612
12/20/2007AppendixReceived Appendix. Proper Person Appellant's Appendix, Volume V. RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER OF 3/20/08. 07-27613
01/02/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-28376
01/02/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 07-28377
01/15/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-01111
03/05/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 7 days. 08-05595
03/13/2008MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave of Court to File Appellan'ts Reply Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages, to wit, Ten Additional Pages. 08-06325
03/14/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Appellant's Supplemental Reply Brief (One Page) and Second Supplemental Appendix (One Page). 08-06438
03/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person. We direct the clerk to return, unfiled, the proposed proper person brief and proper person appendices received on December 20, 2007. We decline to grant appellant permission to file further documents in proper person. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future proper person document submitted for filing. Motions requesting extensions of time to file a reply brief in excess of 30 pages, and to file a one-page supplemental reply brief and appendix are granted. The clerk shall file the reply brief and appendix received on March 13, 2008, and the supplemental brief and appendix received on March 14, 2008. Fn1 [The clerk shall file the proper person "Motion to Allow Filing and Review Issues in Appellant's Proper Person Brief" received on December 20, 2007." 08-06858
03/20/2008MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. to Allow Filing and Review of Issues in Appellant's Proper Person Brief. 07-27610
03/20/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Supplemental Brief. 07-27612
03/20/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Appendix vols. V and VI. 07-27613
03/20/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-06327
03/20/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Supplemental. 08-06329
03/20/2008BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. To Appellant's Reply Brief. 08-06439
03/20/2008AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Second Supplemental Appendix. 08-06457
04/28/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-10455
04/28/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/25/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS 08-24858
10/21/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-25171
10/21/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/04/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2008. 08-25171