Case: A-2757
A-2757
06/14/1950
Application for Writ of Error
DORA JACKSON, KNOX SHERRILL WILL PARKER
JESSIE HUBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/12/1950 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/18/1950 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
08/26/1950 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Respondent | | |
06/21/1950 | Errata Filed | Petitioner | | |
06/14/1950 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/18/1950 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/12/1950 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/29/1950 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/18/1950 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/18/1950 | Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
08/26/1950 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | | ||
08/24/1950 | Motion for Leave to File Amended Brief filed | | ||
07/12/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/22/1950 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/21/1950 | Errata Filed | | ||
06/14/1950 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/14/1950 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jessie Hubert | Respondent | |
Dora Jackson, Knox Sherrill Will Parker | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information