judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. WEDDELL (ROLLAND)

Case Information: 34832
Short Caption:STATE VS. WEDDELL (ROLLAND)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32795 , 36118 , 40907
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9701851CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/09/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/09/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08705
10/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: October 20, 1999. 99-09960
10/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Fast Track Statement and Request to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of 10 Pages. 99-10251
10/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall file the fast track statement within 15 days of the date of this order. Appellant is also granted leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. 99-10585
11/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11198
11/12/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. 99-11199
12/02/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: December 9, 1999. 99-12020
12/03/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Request to file Enlarged Fast Track Response. 99-12112
12/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the 16 page Fast Track Response provisionally submitted on December 3, 1999. 99-12652
12/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-12113
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31]. 00-04621
05/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-07173
05/05/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 15, 2000. 00-07355
06/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-10242
06/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including June 26, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-10580
06/26/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/26/00. 00-10905
06/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Substitute Index to Joint Appendix. 00-10930
06/26/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volume 4. 00-10931
07/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 26, 2000, appellant filed a motion requesting that this court issue an order directing the clerk of this court to (1) remove the two-page index located in the front of Volumes I, II and II of the joint appendix filed in this case and (2) after removal of the index, to insert the two-page index attached to appellant's motion in its place. The clerk shall forthwith make the changes to the joint appendix specified above. 00-11921
07/14/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 12, 2000. 00-12224
08/04/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Transmission of Original Documents. 00-13526
08/04/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/4/00. 00-13540
09/05/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 5, 2000. 00-15626
10/05/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/05/00. 00-17706
11/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's unopposed motion filed on August 4, 2000. The clerk of the district court shall forthwith certify and transmit to this court: (1) 'Exhibit 14Audio Dispatch Tape recorded October 17th, 1997 (Marked June 23rd, 1999, JA 317; admitted June 24th, 1999, JA 431);' and (2) 'Exhibit 16Knife possessed by Jamie Bustamonte on October 17th, 1997 (Marked and admitted June 23rd, 1999, JA 412).' 00-19288
02/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2001, at 9:00 a.m. (NNP01A-MS/RR/DA)
03/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA
06/29/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to File Supplemental Authority. 01-11046
07/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental authority requesting this court to take judicial notice of serveral indictments rendered by a Special Grand Jury of Carson City on June 21, 2001. We deny the motion and direct the clerk of this court to return unfiled the proposed supplemental authority. 01-12022
07/16/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Fred Hill Atcheson. Returned unfiled, the original and two copies of the Supplemental Authority received June 29, 2001.
07/25/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Shearing, Agosti and Rose, JJ. By the Court, Agosti, J. We concur: Shearing and Rose, JJ. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. NNP01A 01-12581
08/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/08/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Hand-delivered. 01-13395
08/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. The Carson City District Attorney shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an answer to respondent's petition for rehearing. 01-14198
09/06/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-15058
09/17/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing.
09/28/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 01-16443
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 28, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file respondent's reply to the State's answer to respondent's petition for rehearing, which this court received on September 28, 2001. 01-16972
10/09/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Reply to Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-16444
01/15/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." Shearing and Agosti, JJ. Rose, J., dissenting. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. 02-00993
01/23/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Hand-delivered. 02-01592
01/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02/15/02 ORDER: fn4[Additionally, the remittitur that was previously issued on January 31, 2002, is hereby recalled.] 02-01054
01/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02/15/02 ORDER: fn4[Additionally, the remittitur that was previously issued on January 31, 2002, is hereby recalled.] 02-01054
02/15/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. The State shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the petition. Thereafter, the matter shall stand submitted for decision before the en banc court without oral argument and on the record and other papers on file herein. fn4[Additionally, the remittitur that was previously issued on January 31, 2002, is hereby recalled.] 02-03078
03/04/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 02-03906
04/10/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Opinion on Reconsideration. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Agosti, J. We concur: Shearing, Leavitt, and Becker, JJ. Rose, J., with whom Maupin, C.J., and Young, J., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. EN BANC 02-06319
04/16/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay of Remittitur. 02-06761
05/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 16, 2002. We hereby stay the issuance of the remittitur until July 22, 2002. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by July 22, 2002, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that respondent has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by July 22, 2002, the remittitur shall issue on July 23, 2002. 02-09386
07/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: 14-Audio Dispatch Tape and 16-Knife this day. 02-12588
07/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 24, 2002. 02-12588
09/05/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed May 22, 2002, and placed on the docket as Case No. 02-307. 02-15267
11/12/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 02-19426