judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY THOMAS V. 102 O STREET, LLC

Case Information: 10-CV-1188
Short Caption:GREGORY THOMAS V. 102 O STREET, LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB19960-10Filed Date:09/16/2010

Opening Event Date:09/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory Thomas NPro SeN
Appellee102 O. Street LLCN
Brian D. RigerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
09/27/2010NOTE RECEIVED from pro se appellant advising that he had learned from L&T on Saturday 9/25/10 the Marshal Service would be in northwest but, he was not on the eviction list at this time.
09/28/2010TMC - appellant's motion for stay - oppo
09/29/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for stay of judgment pending appeal
10/05/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
10/05/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (RZGLNB) (jl)
11/03/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 5, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcripts, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
11/03/2010DISMISSED
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/06/2011RECEIVED- 6-pgs/tape 9/13/10 proc.)w/cd
04/17/2014FiledArchived