judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLINT WAYNE HAMMELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0019)
Case Number:S-08-0019Case Docketed On:01/30/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:CLINT WAYNE HAMMELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CLINT WAYNE HAMMELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantClint Wayne HammellDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
John Derek King
Sarah Miles
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/30/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/01/2008Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/01/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for partial remand for an evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel and for stay of briefing schedule.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/20/2008Order - Denying motion for partial remandOrderDenyFinal
06/05/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client - Sarah Miles, senior law student to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
06/06/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/06/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal