judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34831
Short Caption:MARTIN (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44585
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157347Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/04/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08704
10/07/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 05/24/99, 05/25/99, 05/26/99, 08/04/99 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. 99-09691
10/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-09830
10/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's "Fast Track Statement" and Request for Rough Draft Transcript. 99-10230
10/29/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 05/24/99; 05/25/99; 05/26/99 & 05/27/99 proceedings. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-10617
11/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Martin's Motion for Extension of Time to File his Amended Fast Track Statement. 99-11566
11/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The state's motion to strike the fast track statement is granted. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement and rough draft transcript request filed on October 12, 1999. On October 29, 1999, the rough draft transcripts were filed in this appeal by court reporter Joe D'Amato. On November 19, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the amended fast track statement. The motion is granted. The fast track statement shall be filed and served within 15 days of this order. 99-11913
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Martin's Motion for Extension of Time to file his Amended Fast Track Statement (second request). 99-12832
01/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 17, 1999, appellant's counsel filed a motion for an extension of time to file an amended fast track statement. For the reasons stated below, we deny the motion. Appellant's counsel is directed to file the amended fast track statement with this court within 15 days of the date of this order. 00-00189
01/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-00969
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to Supplement Appellant's Amended Fast Track Statement. 00-00970
02/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Amended Fast Track Statement. 00-01598
02/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 21, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a motion for leave to supplement the amended fast track statement. On February 1, 2000, the State filed a motion to strike the amended fast track statement. Appellant's motion is granted, and the State's motion to strike is denied. Cristalli shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement, if necessary, the amended fast track statement filed on January 21, 2000. The state shall have 20 days from the date any supplement is filed to file its response. 00-03056
03/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Martin's Motion for Extension of Time to File His Supplemental to His Amended Fast Track Statement. 00-04387
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The supplement to the amended fast track statement shall be filed and served within 15 days of this order. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-04711
04/10/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Supplement to Amended Fast Track Statement. 00-05667
04/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-06902
05/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track response shall be filed and served within 5 days of this order. 00-07100
05/05/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 15 Page Fast Track Response. 00-07362
05/08/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The fifteen-page fast track response and the appendix provisionally submitted on May 5, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-07498
05/08/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-07363
05/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-07364
08/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-13875
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-16601
09/22/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Further requests for extensions of time should specify the amount of time requested. 00-16773
10/23/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 10/20/00. 00-18729
10/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-18730
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date respondent has failed to file the answering brief. Respondent shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against respondent's counsel. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve a reply brief. 01-01438
02/08/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-02653
03/13/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Martin's Motion for Extension of time to file his Reply Brief. 01-04469
03/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 13, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief. This motion, again, does not specify the amount of time requested. Appellant having failed to comply with the order entered on September 22, 2000, we deny the motion. Nevertheless, in the interest of judicial efficiency, appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file the reply brief. 01-04670
03/30/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (second request). 01-05574
04/04/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 01-05761
04/04/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
04/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 4, 2001, appellant filed a "Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief." Accordingly, we deny as moot appellant's March 30, 2001, motion for an extension of time to file a reply brief. 01-06562
10/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 01-16732
10/04/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that none of Martin's arguments have merit. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20302
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20395
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20395