judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS PRODUCTION RMT COMPANY v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-08-0018)
Case Number:S-08-0018Case Docketed On:01/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:WILLIAMS PRODUCTION RMT COMPANY v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:WILLIAMS PRODUCTION RMT COMPANY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliams Production RMT CompanyPatrick Reed Day
Delissa L. Minnick
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Karl D. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Natural Resources - Oil and Gas, Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2008 WY 155
Citation:197 P.3d 1258 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/29/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
01/29/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/12/2008Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
03/28/2008Brief - Appellant and Statement of Costs; received copy of designation of record and brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
03/28/2008Motion - Other - to preserve confidentiality of certain documentsMotionOtherFinal
03/31/2008Brief - Replacement copy of brief on diskBriefReplacementFinal
04/15/2008Order - Granting motion to preserve confidentialityOrderGrantFinal
05/15/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on cdBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/30/2008Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant regarding case with same issue under advisement. Will file a notice of similar case to be distributed upon filingEventPhone CallFinal
06/02/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellant's notice of a related appeal involving the same issue of statutory constructionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record (1 box containing 12 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin Hardsocg for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Day for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Day for the appellant and Martin L. Hardsocg for the appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/15/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
01/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - granted in part and requesting briefing on a separate issueOrderPetition for rehearing - grantFinal
02/24/2009Brief - Supplemental appellant on rehearing.BriefSupplemental appellantFinal
02/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's brief on rehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Brief - Supplemental appellee on rehearingBriefSupplemental appelleeFinal
03/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Wyoming Department of Revenue's Reply Brief on RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/14/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/14/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal