judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD R. BELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1187
Short Caption:HAROLD R. BELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3232-10Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold R. Bell Y
Ruth ZanoniNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
B. Michael Ortwein, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ruth Zanoni, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ruth Zanoni, Esquire
10/29/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (4pgs/Tape) 2/23/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 3/17/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7pgs/Tape) 3/18/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7pgs/Tape) 4/6/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (20pgs/Tape) 6/4/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (13pgs/Tape) 8/9/10 proc.
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (11pgs/Tape) 9/14/10 proc. (Part I)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (59pgs/Tape) 9/14/10 proc. ****SUPPLEMENTAL*** (Part II)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (122pgs/Tape) 9/14/10 proc. (Part III) w/CD
11/19/2010RECORD INDEX
11/19/2010RECORD COPIES
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (Pretrial Services report filed 2/23/10)
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/10/2011APPENDIX
02/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/16/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until March 29, 2011 (no oppo)
03/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before March 29, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/29/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/12/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
05/26/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and this matter will be submitted for decision on June 29, 2011, on the record and briefs filed without argument by any party. (JAC)
06/29/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Thompson, King
10/20/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, and Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired*, and King, Senior Judge)
11/10/2011FiledMandate