judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DREYFUSS (PHILIP) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53376
Short Caption:DREYFUSS (PHILIP) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 59518 , 64870
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C232592 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/11/2010 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/11/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. DREYFUSS-C232592 for Philip M. Dreyfuss, Defendant 09-05873
03/06/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/13/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Amended Judgment of Conviction entered on 3/4/09. Due Date: 10 days 09-06544
03/23/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Amended Judgment of Conviction entered on 3/4/09. Certified copy of order 3/18/09. 09-07248
03/27/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07762
03/27/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/07, 06/20/07, 06/22/07, 07/11/07, 11/28/07, 04/16/08, 07/14/08, 07/28/08, 09/19/08, 12/01/08, 12/03/08, 12/09/08, 12/10/08, 12/11/08, 12/12/08, 01/07/09, and 02/04/09. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Richard Kangas. 09-07763
04/07/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/01/07. 09-08726
04/29/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Richard L. Kangas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/1/07; 6/20/07; 6/22/07; 7/11/07; 11/28/07; 4/16/08; 7/14/08; 7/28/08; 9/19/08; 12/1/08; 12/3/08; 12/9/08; 12/10/08; 12/11/08; 12/12/08; 1/7/09; and 2/4/09. 09-10673
07/02/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. 09-16316
07/02/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: August 3, 2009. 09-16317
08/04/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. 09-18966
08/05/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/2/09. 09-19050
10/05/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (1) day. 09-24201
10/06/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief (44) pages. 09-24357
10/06/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Exhibit. 09-24358
10/06/2009BriefReceived Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. (FILED PER ORDER 10/07/09).
10/06/2009AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. Volumes 1-5. (FILED PER ORDER 10/07/09).
10/07/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on October 6, 2009. 09-24456
10/07/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-24459
10/07/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol I. 09-24460
10/07/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol II. 09-24461
10/07/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol III. 09-24462
10/07/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol IV. 09-24467
10/07/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol V. 09-24468
10/07/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion and Directing the District Court Clerk to Transmit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5. due: 20 days. 09-24477
10/26/2009ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Original Exhibit: CD - labeled "State's Exhibit 5." 09-26140
11/04/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 38 Page Answering Brief. 09-26980
11/04/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages for the Answering Brief is approved. 38 pages granted. 09-26981
11/04/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-26982
12/02/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. 09-29121
12/02/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: January 4, 2010. 09-29122
12/31/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-31609
04/14/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 11, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. NNP10-MD/NS/MG 10-09726
05/28/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 10-13894
06/11/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/28/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 10-24870
10/25/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-27743
10/25/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. 10-27743