judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAUTISTA-EREDEA VS. STATE

Case Information: 55178
Short Caption:BAUTISTA-EREDEA VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 78376
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C252761 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/11/2011 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:04/11/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/31/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 09-31656
01/07/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-00344
01/07/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/13/09 (R. Vincent), 3/19/09 (K. Schmidt), 5/12/09, 5/19/09, 8/11/09, 8/13/09, 8/25/09 (M. Ramsey), 8/31/09, 9/1/09, 9/2/09, 9/3/09, 10/22/09 (L. Bahr), 12/1/09, 12/3/09 (B. Nelson). 10-00346
01/12/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/13/09. 10-00886
01/26/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/12/09, 5/19/09, 8/11/09, 8/13/09, 8/25/09. 10-02212
02/04/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/19/09. 10-03154
02/04/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/01/09 and 12/03/09. 10-03160
04/27/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. (30) days. 10-10860
04/27/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: June 1, 2010. 10-10861
06/02/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-14122
06/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 1, 2010. 10-14205
07/02/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief. (40) pages 10-17232
07/02/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages for the Opening Brief is approved. 40 pages granted. 10-17233
07/02/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-17235
07/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 10-17236
07/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 10-17238
07/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 10-17239
07/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4 10-17240
07/02/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5 10-17241
08/09/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief. 10-20474
08/25/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time Motion for Extension of Time 10-21770
08/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Time for filing answering brief extended to 9/23/10. 10-21972
09/23/2010BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. 10-24534
10/25/2010MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief. 10-27724
10/25/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipualtion to extend time to file reply brief is approved. Brief due: November 22, 2010. 10-27731
11/23/2010MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of 15 Pages. 10-30563
11/23/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief total (18) pages. 10-30567
11/23/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-30568
02/18/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before a panel of this court on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-05374
03/04/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for April 11, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-06652
03/28/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-09291
04/11/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP
03/21/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED in part and REVERSED in part and REMANDED for a new trial as to the kidnapping charge." NNP11-MC/MG/KP 12-08991
04/16/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-12124
04/16/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
05/01/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 25, 2012. 12-12124