Case Information: 55177 | |||
Short Caption: | BAKER (DEONTE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C255359 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/31/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-31646 | |
12/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/31/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-31647 | |
01/04/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 06/22/09 and 12/08/09. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Bill Nelson. Filed in district court on: 12/30/09. | 10-00179 | |
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/22/09. | 10-03157 | |
02/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/08/09. | 10-03168 | |
02/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Due to Absence from the Office. | 10-03625 | |
02/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 5, 2010. | 10-03937 | |
05/05/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-11566 | |
05/05/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-11567 | |
05/25/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-13524 | |
09/29/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for a new probation revocation hearing before a different district judge." | 10-25212 | |
10/27/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-28131 | |
10/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. | 10-28131 |