Case Information: 55193 | |||
Short Caption: | SANTILLANES (ISMAEL) VS. NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 09EW000231B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/23/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-00196 | |
01/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02234 | |
02/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | 10-02733 | |
04/23/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. | 10-10627 | |
04/23/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14818 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15935 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 8, 2010. | 10-15935 |