Case Information: 55207 | |||
Short Caption: | BERGER (SEAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55212 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR042972 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-00382 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/07/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 10-00458 | |
01/20/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-01573 | |
01/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Request to Consolidate Case Number 55207 and 55212. | 10-01575 | |
01/20/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. (Appellant's Request for Evidentiary Hearing Transcript in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief in the Denial of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus). | 10-01581 | |
01/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals, Redesignating Appeal in Docket No. 55207, and Setting Briefing Schedule. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. Nos. 55207/55212. | 10-01677 | |
01/26/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02142). | 10-02142 | |
01/26/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 2. CD-ROM included with appendix. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02143). | 10-02143 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/16/09. Nos. 55207/55212. | 10-02263 | |
02/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Supplemental Appellant Appendix. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02709). | ||
02/12/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-03876). | 10-03876 | |
10/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Affirming in Docket No. 55207 and Directing Full Briefing in Docket No. 55212. "We affirm the district court's order in Docket No. 55207." Nos. 55207/55212. | 10-26463 | |
11/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-28993 | |
11/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/02/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 19, 2010. | 10-28993 |