Case Information: 55195 | |||
Short Caption: | VINING JR. (TRACY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR09-1599 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) (Request for Rough Draft Transcripts is attached.) | 10-00244 | |
01/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cindy Lee Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/8/09. | 10-03004 | |
02/16/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-04000 | |
02/16/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume I | 10-04001 | |
02/16/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume II | 10-04002 | |
03/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Response. Due date: 10 days. | 10-06736 | |
03/18/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-07186 | |
05/12/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Barbara Johnson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/19/09. | 10-12321 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14761 | |
07/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15777 | |
07/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/26/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 14, 2010. | 10-15777 |