Case Information: 55203 | |||
Short Caption: | CSOMOS VS. VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 60887 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A582567 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/12/2010 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/05/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00364 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00365 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $250 from Leon M. Greenberg | ||
01/12/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan | 10-00902 | |
01/19/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-01504 | |
01/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 10-01505 | |
01/22/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the program. | 10-01850 | |
01/29/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. | 10-02540 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 10-05357 | |
03/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-05525 | |
03/02/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-05526 | |
04/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-10332 | |
04/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-10333 | |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time to File and Serve Respondent's Answering Brief and Appellant's Reply Brief. | 10-11900 | |
05/12/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Amended. STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 5/24/10. | ||
05/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Withdrawal of Amended Docketing Statement | 10-12410 | |
05/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Strike and Approving Stipulation for Extensions of Time to File Answering Brief and Reply Brief. We direct the clerk to strike the amended docketing statement. Answsering brief due 6/21/10 and Reply brief, if any due 8/20/10. | 10-13570 | |
06/22/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-16231 | |
08/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief | 10-21788 | |
04/08/2011 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities - Appellant's Notice Of Supplemental Authority Pursuant To Nev. R. App. P. 31(E). | 11-10574 | |
07/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. | 11-19853 | |
07/05/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/26/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address - Attorney Leon Greenberg. | 11-22530 | |
09/19/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-28535 | |
10/17/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-31966 | |
10/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
10/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 21, 2011. | 11-31966 |