Case Information: 55181 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: SCHWEICKERT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52097 , 55145 , 57544 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0801258 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Richard Schweickert check no. 104. | ||
01/04/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition. | 10-00109 | |
01/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Emergency Petition on Dist. Ct. Judge.) | 10-00110 | |
01/07/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Affidavit of Service. | 10-00474 | |
06/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Response to Motion to Disqualify of Justice Hardesty. Appellants/petitioners in Docket Nos. 55145 and 55181, respectively, have submitted motions seeking my recusal from further participation in these proceedings, which were provisionally received in both cases on March 8, 2010. The clerk of this court is directed to file these motions. I nonetheless voluntarily recuse myself from participation in these matters. Nos. 55145/55181. | 10-17053 | |
06/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recuse the Honorable James W. Hardesty. | 10-05970 | |
06/30/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Motion to Recuse the Honorable James W. Hardesty. | 10-05971 | |
06/30/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 55145) and Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition (Docket No. 55181). "We deny the petition." SNP10-RP/MD/KP fn[In light of this order, we deny all pending motions as moot.] Nos. 55145/55181. | 10-17062 | |
07/27/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-19368 | |
07/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |