Case Information: 55199 | |||
Short Caption: | VANYO VS. HACK (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55081 , 56696 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 06D366759 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/06/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-00305 | |
01/06/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00306 | |
01/15/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brian Vanyo - check no. 459. | ||
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06204 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06785 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06785 |