Case Information: 55198 | |||
Short Caption: | SHOKRIAN VS. WEBER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55837 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A566033 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/06/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-00297 | |
01/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay form for Parties Without Attorneys. | 09-31670 | |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beverly Rodeo Development Corp. check no. 10777. | ||
01/21/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Stay Form for Parties without Attorneys due: January 27, 2010. | 10-01793 | |
01/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Stay. | 10-02497 | |
02/12/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03906 | |
02/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 03/10/10). Appellants' Amendment to Appeal and Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal; Notice of Appearance. | 10-04535 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 10-05235 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Stay and Dismissing Appeal in Part. We dismiss this appeal as to Prestige and Beverly Rodeo. The appeal may proceed as to Shokrian, individually. We direct the clerk to strike the motion for stay filed on February 19, 2010. Notice of Appearance due: 15 days. | 10-06191 | |
03/15/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/1/10 addressed to Montez Nazareth Law. Per USPS, "return to sender, vacant, unable to forward." Address updated per State Bar of NV. Rec for Docs remailed to new address. | 10-06686 | |
03/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order. Submitted by Appellant Amir Shokrian. | 10-06835 | |
03/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Appearance and Request for Clarification of Order (Attorney Rummel Mor Bautista). | 10-07296 | |
03/23/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 3/1/10 addressed to Montez Nazareth Law. Per USPS, "return to sender, vacant, unable to forward." Address updated per State Bar of NV. Order remailed to new address. | 10-07563 | |
07/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Appellants Prestige of Beverly Hills, Inc., Amir Shokrian and Beverly Rodeo Development Co., Inc. Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) | 10-18792 | |
08/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw and Notice to Confirm as Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to remove Rummel Mor Bautista as counsel in both appeals. Attorney Jude Nazareth Notice due: 10 days. Nos. 55198/55837. | 10-21370 | |
01/24/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-02262 | |
02/18/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-05285 | |
02/18/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/02/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 25, 2011. | 11-05285 |