Case Information: 55192 | |||
Short Caption: | MORGAN (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55136 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C254778 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-00187 | |
01/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-00188 | |
01/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00189 | |
01/06/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-00259 | |
02/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or case appellant statement and rough draft transcript request due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-02657 | |
02/02/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-02795 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/2/09, 9/9/09, 9/30/09, 10/5/09, 10/6/09, 10/7/09, 10/8/09, 10/9/09, 11/23/09. Court Reporter:Jessica Ramirez. Filed in district court on: 1/6/10. | 10-02846 | |
02/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-03748 | |
02/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion in Part. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 18, 2010. | 10-03931 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 1. | 10-07286 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 2. | 10-07287 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 3. | 10-07288 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 4. | 10-07289 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 5. | 10-07290 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 6. | 10-07291 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 7. | 10-07292 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 8. | 10-07354 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days. | 10-08145 | |
04/12/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-09416 | |
05/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (20) days. | 10-11227 | |
05/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: May 24, 2010. | 10-11422 | |
05/24/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-13382 | |
05/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-13383 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. | 10-23187 | |
10/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25949 | |
10/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/19/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 14, 2010. | 10-25949 |