judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LONDOS VS. EICON

Case Information: 32137
Short Caption:LONDOS VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9601728AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/05/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/17/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Received filing fee of $200 (cash).
05/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
05/12/1998Other Other. Corrected address for appellant Harry Londos and remailed: receipt of 4/13/98; receipt of 4/17/98; Order filed 5/6/98.
06/05/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 4 (copies).
06/05/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/1998Other Other. Filed Notification of Name Change.
07/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-12703
08/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14566
08/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2000. 00-14566