judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and CONSOLENERGY, INC., f/k/a CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0280)
Case Number:S-07-0280Case Docketed On:12/04/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and CONSOLENERGY, INC., f/k/a CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
Full Title:JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, and CONSOLENERGY, INC., f/k/a CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJacobs Ranch Coal CompanyAmy Jo Stefonick
Andrea Wang
Thomas P. Johnson
AppelleeThunder Basin Coal Company, LLCStephen D. Bell
Scott P. Sinor
Randall T. Cox
AppelleeConsolenergy, Inc.Clint Andrew Langer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Natural Resources - Mining and Minerals, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 101
Citation:191 P.3d 125

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/04/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/04/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/11/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant. Insufficient number of copies for admission pro hac vice submitted to Court.EventPhone CallFinal
12/12/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Thomas P. Johnson and Andrea Wang to appear on behalf of appellantMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
12/12/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/09/2008Event - Phone call to R.T. Cox re pro hac vice admission; advised that Mr. Davison is no longer on case.EventPhone CallFinal
01/10/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice on behalf of Stephen D. Bell and Scott P. SinorMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
01/10/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
01/18/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/05/2008Brief - Appellee - Thunder Basin Coal CompanyBriefAppelleeFinal
03/05/2008Event - Phone Call - Called Mr. Cox. Appellee's brief was not signed by local counsel. He will send an original signature page to attach to brief by Federal Express today. Also received faxed copy of signature page of brief signed by Mr. Cox today.EventPhone CallFinal
03/06/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellee ConsolenergyBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
03/06/2008Brief - Other - original signature page for brief of appelleeBriefOtherFinal
03/10/2008Stipulation - Other to supplement recordStipulationOtherFinal
03/18/2008Order - Other - approving stipulation to supplement the recordOrderOtherFinal
03/24/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas P. Johnson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/15/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacate, unopposedMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/15/2008Order - Denying motion to vacate setting for oral argumentOrderDenyFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen D. Bell for Thunder Basin Coal.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas P. Johnson, Amy Jo Stefonick and Andrea Wang, argument by Mr. Johnson for appellant; Randall T. Cox and Stephen D. Bell, argument by Mr. Bell for appellee Thunder Basin Coal Company. No appearance for Consolenergy, Inc.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/17/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal