judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLINTON ELDRIDGE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1153
Short Caption:CLINTON ELDRIDGE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6638-83Filed Date:07/28/2010

Opening Event Date:07/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/14/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClinton Eldridge NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (RECVD)
07/28/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Appeal.
07/29/2010TMC - appellant's motion for permission to appeal
11/22/2010DISMISSED
11/22/2010 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION OF THIS COURT ORDER IN APPEAL NO 09CO1240 that directed the Clerk to NOT ACCEPT ANY FURTHER FILINGS OR APPEALS FROM APPELLANT W/O LEAVE OF THIS COURT and APPELLANT'S motion for leave to file the lodged appeal, it is ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE APPEAL IS DENIED and this APPEAL IS DISMISSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the CLERK SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY FUTURE FILING FROM APPELLANT ARISING FROM SUPERIOR COURT NO. F6638-83. (RZTHNW) (rm)
12/14/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived