Case Information: 55183 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE, DEPT. OF TAXATION VS. MASCO BUILDER CABINET GROUP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 60342 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A589073 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Douglas for Justice Parraguirre | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 01/05/2010 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/16/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00121 | |
01/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/05/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan | 10-00242 | |
01/11/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/11/10 | 10-00839 | |
01/25/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-01985 | |
02/18/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/12/10 | 10-04375 | |
03/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-06925 | |
03/18/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-07220 | |
04/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/01/09. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | 10-08592 | |
06/16/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols 1-4. | ||
06/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-16135 | |
07/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-17808 | |
07/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: August 16, 2010. | 10-17813 | |
08/18/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-21288 | |
09/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-24131 | |
03/16/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. This case shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 11-07989 | |
10/20/2011 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Saitta/Douglas/Hardesty. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 67. SNP11S | 11-32396 | |
11/14/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-34905 | |
11/14/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/23/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 18, 2011. | 11-34905 |