Case Information: 53371 | |||
Short Caption: | PEEK (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080467 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/11/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/05/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-05727 | |
03/05/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-05730 | |
03/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. Appearances - Hearing. (SEALED). | 09-05813 | |
03/16/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of No Request of Transcript. | 09-06585 | |
03/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Order Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 09-06670 | |
03/23/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Notice of Compliance with attached certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/26/09 - Judgment. | 09-07270 | |
03/24/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. | 09-07435 | |
03/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Oversized Fast Track Statement. | 09-07653 | |
03/26/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. (Returned unfiled per 04/08/09 order.) | 09-07654 | |
03/26/2009 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 09-07655 | |
04/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we conclude that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the fast track statement received on March 26, 2009. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix received on March 26, 2009. fn1-[Counsel need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix previously filed in this court.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the schedule set forth in NRAP 31(a)(1). | 09-08847 | |
04/08/2009 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (Full briefing ordered.) | ||
04/08/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 09-07655 | |
04/24/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-10259 | |
05/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 25, 2009. | 09-12951 | |
05/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering brief due June 25, 2009. | 09-12952 | |
06/24/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-15630 | |
07/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-17148 | |
08/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-19584 | |
08/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-02972 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04512 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/09/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 2010. | 10-04512 |