Case Information: 55206 | |||
Short Caption: | WARDEN VS. HALL (GEORGE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46815 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032582 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/03/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-00378 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/14/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-01237 | |
05/04/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-11382 | |
05/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-11399 | |
05/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-13563 | |
06/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-14325 | |
06/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/29/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-25186 | |
10/27/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-28213 | |
10/27/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
11/05/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 28, 2010. | 10-28213 |