Case Information: 55208 | |||
Short Caption: | WEST, JR. VS. BADER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701469 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/13/2010 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00385 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00388 | |
01/13/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King | 10-01028 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alessi & Koenig. Check No. 2798. | ||
01/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely | 10-01837 | |
01/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny respondents' motion to dismiss. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew motion upon completion of settlement proceedings. | 10-02544 | |
02/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-03614 | |
02/11/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/18/10 | 10-03771 | |
03/24/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-07714 | |
03/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 10-07931 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Fn1[in light of this order we waive the requirement for appellants to file a docketing statement] NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 10-08089 | |
03/29/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
03/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement. | 10-08311 |