Case Information: 55209 | |||
Short Caption: | REEVES VS. JOHN BARSANTI INSURANCE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0900873 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/16/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-00394 | |
01/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00396 | |
01/07/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Application to Waive Fee and Costs. (submitted by District Court Clerk) | 10-00513 | |
02/16/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-04098 | |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing District Court to Rule on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Service of Notice of Appeal and Proper Person Appeal Statement. District Court Order due: 30 days. Appellant's Proof of Service (NOA and Appeal Statement) due: 15 days. | 10-06592 | |
03/22/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO WAIVE FEES AND COSTS | 10-07494 | |
03/25/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Proof of service in response to order issued 03/12/10. | 10-07823 | |
06/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-14463 | |
06/11/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notification of Intent to Participate. | 10-15143 | |
06/16/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 1 of 3 | 10-15625 | |
06/16/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2 of 3 | 10-15626 | |
06/16/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3 of 3 | 10-15627 | |
06/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/05/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Douglas, J., dissenting. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption to match how it is set forth in this order.] | 11-37160 | |
12/30/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-40110 | |
12/30/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/09/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 2, 2012. | 11-40110 |